CA SB380 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 11008.14 of, and to add Section 11450.17 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: child support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB380 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 380 Bradford Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB380 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 380 Bradford Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB380 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2888.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3268.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1356.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1183.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 850.) (April 25). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11008.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11450.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11450.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |