CA SB387 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 800 of the Penal Code, relating to statute of limitations.
Title
The Joshua Lacy Law: statute of limitations: felony hit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-01-10 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 2624.) | |
2011-12-15 | Set for hearing January 10. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-05 | Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing April 5. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |