CA SB387 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49428.15 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: school employee and pupil training: youth mental and behavioral health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB387 Portantino (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Assembly | June 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2794.) (January 20). |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2753.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Set for hearing January 12. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Portantino. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 861.) (April 20). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49428.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |