CA SB389 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1051 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
State Water Resources Control Board: investigation of water right.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB389 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Assembly - SB 389 Allen Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB389 Allen (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Assembly - SB 389 Allen Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB389 Allen (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 486, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2632.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2930.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 16). |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 1359.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1168.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 899.) (April 25). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 1051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |