CA SB397 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13978.9 to the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
San Francisco Bay area: public transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | January 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | April 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13978.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |