CA SB477 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 65400 of the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
General plan: annual report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB477 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 477 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB477 Wiener et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 477 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB477 Wiener et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2021-10-05 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1283.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1193.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 553.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65400 | New Code | See Bill Text |