CA SB505 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 918, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 918, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11106.4 to the Penal Code, relating to crime prevention.
Title
Peace officers: welfare checks: firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB505 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 505 Jackson Senate Third Reading By MELENDEZ (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB505 Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 505 Jackson Senate Third Reading By MELENDEZ (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB505 Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 918, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4759.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4676.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4787.) |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6234.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1174.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1015.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 484.) (April 10). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 11800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47634.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51871 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51872 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51874 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52295.55 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78910.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78910.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11106.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5150.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |