CA SB568 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42476.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Electronic waste: export.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB568 Newman Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-08-31 - Assembly - SB 568 Newman Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB568 Newman (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-31 - Assembly - SB 568 Newman Senate Third Reading By Irwin (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB568 Newman (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2593.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 2862.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 1258.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1025.) (May 8). |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | May 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 794.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42476.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |