CA SB79 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-24 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-24 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the Budget Act of 2013.
Title
Budget Act of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB79 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 893.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |