CA SB808 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 16520, 23910, and 30105 of, and to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 29180) to Division 7 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: identifying information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 3 SB808 De Le (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 808 De Leon Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB808 De Le (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 808 De Leon Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 46 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB808 De Le (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 4994.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 6707.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6345.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 2687.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2645.) (January 23). |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2591.) (January 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29180 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 30105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18872 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 322 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 337 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6357.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6357.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 6357.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 6357.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |