CA SB816 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1339.40 and 1339.43 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 4512 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and human services.
Title
Hospice facilities: developmental disabilities: intellectual disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - SB 816 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB816 Committee on Health (Hernandez) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB816 Committee on Health (Hernandez) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 289, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and G.O. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 618.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 11. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1339.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1339.43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |