CA SB835 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14288 of, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 18770) to Chapter 4 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture.
Title
Food animals: medically important antimicrobial drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB835 Hill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 835 Hill Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB835 Hill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 835 Hill Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB835 Hill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4469.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 3322.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3018.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 14288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 18770 | New Code | See Bill Text |