CA SB85 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 96.11 and 97.81 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance.
Title
Local government finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 Cogdill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - SB 85 Cogdill Senate Third Reading By YAMADA (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 85 Cogdill Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - SB 85 Cogdill Senate Third Reading By YAMADA (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 85 Cogdill Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 Committee on B. & F.R. (Ducheny) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-02-24 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-02-12 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2010-02-11 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2796.) To enrollment. | |
2010-02-10 | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2792.) | |
2010-02-05 | Set for hearing February 10. | |
2010-02-03 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2757.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-01 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3891.) To Senate. | |
2009-10-26 | In Assembly. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Placed on third reading. Read third time. Amended. (Page 3551.) To third reading. | |
2009-10-14 | Returned to Assembly for further action. | |
2009-09-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-11 | Read second time. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3360.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 10.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3040.) Re-referred to Com. On APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2009-09-03 | From inactive file to third reading file. | |
2009-09-02 | Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico. | |
2009-08-17 | Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian. | |
2009-06-15 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-04-16 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 516.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-01 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-01-22 | Read first time. | |
2009-01-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |