CA SB85 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2787, 2791, and 2796 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 224 and 49015 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 13108, 13146, 13146.1, 13146.2, 13146.3, 13217, 38591.2, 43019, 43019.1, and 43019.2 of, and to add Sections 13146.6, 16022.5, and 44391.4 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 2795 of, to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 4050) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 4 of, and to add Section 4123 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public resources: omnibus trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 B. & F.R. (M (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 85 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 85 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB85 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB85 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1599.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 2303.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 666.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |