CA SB925 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 223, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 223, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27491.25 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 20011 of the Vehicle Code, relating to fatal vehicular accidents.
Title
Fatal vehicular accidents: chemical test results.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-08 - Senate - Special Consent SB925 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 925 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB925 Bates (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 925 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB925 Bates (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 223, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4684.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5640.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3582.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3328.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27491.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 20011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |