CA SB984 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-29 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2504 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public agencies: project labor agreements.
Sponsors
Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB984 Wahab et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 984 Wahab Senate Third Reading By Haney (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB984 Wahab et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 984 Wahab Senate Third Reading By Haney (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB984 Wahab et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and G.O. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3966.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3757.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 10. Noes 5. Page 3721.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | April 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L., P.E. & R. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 2504 | New Code | See Bill Text |