CA SBX12 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1357.51, 1357.500, 1357.503, 1357.504, 1357.509, 1357.512, 1363, 1389.5, and 1399.829 of, to amend the heading of Article 11.7 (commencing with Section 1399.825) of Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of, to amend and add Sections 1389.4 and 1389.7 of, to add Sections 1348.96 and 1399.836 to, to add Article 11.8 (commencing with Section 1399.845) to Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 1399.816 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB2 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - SB2 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By PAN First Extraordinary Session (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Hernandez (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Assembly - SB2 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By PAN First Extraordinary Session (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB2 Hernandez (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session. | |
2013-05-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 60.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 93.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 17). |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 18.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (February 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (February 21). |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Set for hearing February 21 in APPR. pending receipt. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Set for hearing February 20. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. |