CO HB1037 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enforcing Laws Against Designer Drugs
Title
Enforcing Laws Against Designer Drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1037, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |