CO HB1059 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by the department of public safety to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By Department Of Public Safety To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1059 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Motion to reconsider the motion to postpone indefinitely House Bill 17-1059. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1059 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Judiciary: Motion to reconsider the motion to postpone indefinitely House Bill 17-1059. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Reconsider to Judiciary |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |