CO HB1087 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-7)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-7)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of an additional pathway for educators to gain an endorsement for special education instruction.
Title
Professional Endorsement Special Education Teaching
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1087 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1087 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1087 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1087 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1087, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |