CO HB1096 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enactment of the "School Psychologists Licensure Interstate Compact".
Title
School Psychologist Licensure Interstate Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1096 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1096 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1096 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1096 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |