CO HB1099 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tenant screening documentation for residential leases.
Title
Portable Screening Report For Residential Leases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1099 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 23-1099, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1099 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 23-1099, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2023-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-02-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-08 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |