CO HB1142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creating an option for parents who seek to voluntarily delegate certain parental responsibilities to a safe family for a limited period of time without relinquishing legal custody of their child, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Safe Family Option For Parents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1142 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.010) (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1142 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.010) (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |