CO HB1232 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning equity in access to clinical trials for individuals enrolled in the medical assistance program.
Title
Equity In Access To Clinical Trials In Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1232 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1232 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 05/26/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance + Appropriations |