CO HB1233 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protection of the historical consumptive use analysis of a water right involved in a water conservation program.
Title
Protect Water Historical Consumptive Use Analysis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1233 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1233 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1233 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1233 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |