CO HB1242 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of pharmacy technicians by the state board of pharmacy, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Board Of Pharmacy Regulate Pharmacy Technicians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1242 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1242, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |