CO HB1263 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an authorization for the commissioner of insurance to issue a license that allows a limited lines producer to sell limited lines self-storage insurance.
Title
Limited Lines Self-storage Insurance License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |