CO HB1288 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the penalties for DUI offenders who commit their fourth and subsequent DUI offenses.
Title
Penalties For Felony DUI Offenders
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Saine [R] | Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Lois Court [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1288 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1288 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |