CO HB1319 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Colorado professional fire fighters license plate, and, in connection therewith, specifying that the Colorado professional fire fighters license plate expires upon the transfer of a motor vehicle and making an appropriation.
Title
Fire Fighters License Plate Expiration on Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1319 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1319 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1319, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1319 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1319 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1319 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1319, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1319 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |