CO HJR1022 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-19)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-19)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recognizing the first full week of April 2024 as "Direct Care Worker Appreciation Week", and, in connection therewith, recognizing the first full week of every April thereafter as "Direct Care Worker Appreciation Week".
Title
Direct Care Worker Appreciation Week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2024-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |