CO SB019 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Promote Water Conservation
Title
Promote Water Conservation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee of the Whole. Recommend Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee of the Whole. Recommend Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 as amended (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend Amendment L. 001, Page 1, Line 21, strike "3,4, OR" and substitute "4,5, OR", line 22, strike "5," and substitute "6" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 as amended (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend Amendment L. 001, Page 1, Line 21, strike "3,4, OR" and substitute "4,5, OR", line 22, strike "5," and substitute "6" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee of the Whole. Recommend Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee of the Whole. Recommend Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 as amended (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend Amendment L. 001, Page 1, Line 21, strike "3,4, OR" and substitute "4,5, OR", line 22, strike "5," and substitute "6" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 as amended (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to amend Amendment L. 001, Page 1, Line 21, strike "3,4, OR" and substitute "4,5, OR", line 22, strike "5," and substitute "6" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-019 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-01 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |