CO SB030 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increased consumer protections for customers of investor-owned utilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Consumer Protections For Utility Customers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.008) (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.008) (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-05-28 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |