CO SB030 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-20)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-20)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expansion of the water resources review committee to the water resources and agriculture review committee.
Title
Expand Water Resources Review Committe To Include Agriculture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-030 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 22-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-030 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-07 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |