CO SB152 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Procedures For Filing Reports With The GA
Title
Procedures For Filing Reports With The GA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-152 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved for reconsideration of the previous motion (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-152 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-152 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved for reconsideration of the previous motion (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-152 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 12-152 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 12-152 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved for reconsideration of the previous motion (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-152 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-152 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved for reconsideration of the previous motion (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-152 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 12-152 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) to Senate Bill 12-152 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-28 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs |