CO SB152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Review Asbestos Abatement
Title
Sunset Review Asbestos Abatement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-152 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-152 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-152 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |