CO SB152 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Standardize Insurers' Financial Transaction Req
Title
Standardize Insurers' Financial Transaction Req
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Rep. Jovan Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-152 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-152 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-152 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |