CO SB152 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of the custom processing of meat animals, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations in the 2022 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Continue Custom Processing Meat Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 23-152 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-20 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |