CO SB155 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ensuring accurate payment of family and medical leave benefits.
Title
Payment of Family & Medical Leave Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |