CO SB157 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Continue Colorado Work Share Program
Title
Sunset Continue Colorado Work Share Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-157 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-157 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-157 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-157 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-157 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-2. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-157 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-157 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |