CO SB157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the fire suppression programs of the division of fire prevention and control in the department of public safety, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendation contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Fire Suppression Registration And Inspection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-157 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |