CO SB181 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-04 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-04 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the Colorado alcohol impact and recovery enterprise, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Alcohol Impact & Recovery Enterprise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 24-181 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 24-181 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-01 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.040 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.030 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment A) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 24-181 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-01 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.040 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.030 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-181, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment A) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
Subjects
Fiscal Policy & Taxes
Health Care & Health Insurance
Liquor, Tobacco, & Marijuana
State Revenue & Budget
Health Care & Health Insurance
Liquor, Tobacco, & Marijuana
State Revenue & Budget