CO SB193 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restraints Used On Pregnant Inmates
Title
Restraints Used On Pregnant Inmates
Sponsors
Sen. Evie Hudak [D] | Rep. Claire Levy [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-193, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-10 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |