CO SB204 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning technical revisions to the procurement code.
Title
Technical Revisions to Procurement Code
Sponsors
Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. Janice Rich [R] | Rep. Brandi Bradley [R] | Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D] |
Sen. Nick Hinrichsen [D] | Rep. Elisabeth Epps [D] | Sen. Kevin Priola [D] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] |
Rep. Don Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-204 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-204 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-204 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-204 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |