CO SJR009 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-38)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-38)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning honoring Colorado veterans on the seventy-sixth anniversary of the end of World War II.
Title
76th Anniversary Of End Of World War II
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/05/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |