CT HB05087 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt veterans from payment of the Passport to the Parks fee.
Title
An Act Exempting Veterans From The Passport To The Parks Motor Vehicle Registration Fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2020-02-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |