CT HB05144 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infections And Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |