CT HB05148 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit pregnant patients to exercise a living will.
Title
An Act Concerning Pregnant Patients Exercising Living Wills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 275 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-14 | House | Public Act 18-11 |
2018-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate Calendar Number 425 |
2018-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-11 | House | File Number 413 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 262 |
2018-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |