CT HB05149 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow lifeguards to receive cardiopulmonary resuscitation certification by the American Safety and Health Institute.
Title
An Act Concerning Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 270 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-08 | House | Public Act 14-36 |
2014-05-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-02 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 335 |
2014-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | File Number 337 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 199 |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2014-03-07 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health |
2014-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |