CT HB05211 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that any cemetery association, organized in accordance with the provisions of sections 33-1025 to 33-1047, inclusive, that receives or expends any public funds, as defined in section 7-401, shall be a "public agency" and subject to the provisions of the Freedom of Information Act, as defined in section 1-200.
Title
An Act Concerning The Application Of The Freedom Of Information Act To Certain Cemetery Associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 481 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 345 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-24 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |