CT HB05355 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To examine issues related to the protection of certain waters of the Upper Farmington River Valley.
Title
An Act Concerning The Water Resources Of The Upper Farmington River Valley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 216 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 120 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 120 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-09 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-08 | House | Public Act 24-13 |
2024-05-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-03 | Senate | File Number 659 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 429 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3819 |
2024-04-02 | House | File Number 193 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 160 |
2024-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |